Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1500 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7284 Week
» 28673 Month
» 148200 Year
» 3175053 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1524 |
14/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47004 |
10/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
417 |
To Service |
14/06/1963 to Finsbury Park (34G) |
Withdrawn |
31/08/2006 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Information |
Carried worksplate '419' but on paper it was '417' |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/06/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/02/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/02/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
06/2006 |
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
11/04/2012 |
Information |
Embsay & Bolton Abbey Steam Railway |
Link |
www.pogo.org.uk/railway/ |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1524 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 417 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47004 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
31/08/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47004 |
|
|