Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2155 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19958 Week
» 72974 Month
» 192501 Year
» 3219354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15235 |
15/12/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1951 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15235 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
09/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
31/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15235 |
|
|
11/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|