Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 808 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18611 Week
» 71627 Month
» 191154 Year
» 3218007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15234 |
01/12/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/12/1951 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Eastleigh Works |
10/06/1960 |
n/a |
10/06/1960 |
11/06/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
63,462 |
Mileage since last General |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15234 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/06/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960. Stopped on 10/06/1960 |
|
|
22/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15234 |
|
|
02/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|