Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1523 |
12/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47003 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/06/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1984 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
17/06/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1523 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 416 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47003 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
06/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47003 |
|
|
17/07/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|