Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 400 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6184 Week
» 27573 Month
» 147100 Year
» 3173953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1501 |
13/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47402 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/11/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/09/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/11/1962 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/09/1969 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
12/1993 |
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
11/04/2012 |
Link |
www.elrdiesel.info/ |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1501 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 343 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/09/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47402 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/06/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47402 |
|
|