Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 621 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6405 Week
» 27794 Month
» 147321 Year
» 3174174 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D147 |
16/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46010 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
16/12/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
04/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/10/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D147 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
13/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
25/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46010 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46010 |
|
|