Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1294 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14700 Week
» 67716 Month
» 187243 Year
» 3214096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1347 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4347 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) |
2139 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62139 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
808 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1949 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1898 |
SEL |
|
Selby |
S |
01/1936 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LTH |
|
Louth |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LTH |
Louth |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
WDN |
LTH |
Louth |
on |
13/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1347 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 808 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4347 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2139 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (LTH) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62139 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2139 |
|
|