Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1612 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19415 Week
» 72431 Month
» 191958 Year
» 3218811 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1681 |
m/e |
09/1911 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5373 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25373 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
British Railways |
58012 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1911 |
PTARMIGAN |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
George V |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
5024 |
To Service |
During 09/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/05/1948 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1911 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/05/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7B |
Bangor |
w/e |
28/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1911 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1681, name: PTARMIGAN Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 5024 |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5373 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25373 |
|
|
05/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25373 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 58012 but not taken up |
|
|