Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 470 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18273 Week
» 71289 Month
» 190816 Year
» 3217669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
3 |
m/e |
10/1914 |
Great Western Railway |
438 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway (1947) |
309 |
on |
17/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 10/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/02/1953 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1914 |
SED |
|
Swansea East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
19/04/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 3 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 438 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
17/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 309 |
|
|
16/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 309 |
|
|