Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2856 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16262 Week
» 69278 Month
» 188805 Year
» 3215658 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
404 |
m/e |
09/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
390 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 09/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/08/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
Total Mileage |
668,888 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 404 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 390 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
26/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 390 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|