Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
400 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
386 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/04/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys |
Total Mileage |
857,104 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1920 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 400 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 386 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
27/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 386 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|