Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 822 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3467 Week
» 6049 Month
» 270682 Year
» 1492247 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 149 m/e 05/1920
GWR 376 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Mon 14/01/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1920
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/06/1954
88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
   Withdrawn 14/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   m/e 31/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 149
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 376    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
14/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 376    

prev prev