Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 127 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 3987 Week
» 6569 Month
» 271202 Year
» 1492767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 140 m/e 04/1919
GWR 374 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 04/1919
Withdrawal Mon 19/09/1955
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1919
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/02/1953
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
   Withdrawn 19/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 140
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 374    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
19/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 374    

prev prev