Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
127 |
m/e |
07/1916 |
Great Western Railway |
361 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 07/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/01/1957 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys |
Total Mileage |
649,228 |
Information |
Mileage since rebuild in 1925 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1916 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88A |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 127 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 361 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
29/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 361 |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|
06/1957 |
Report |
Report: A report that ex-Taff Vale 0-6-2 tank No. 361 had been installed at Newton Abbot as a stationary boiler is claimed as an error by another reader; the engine did in fact go to Newton Abbot, he writes, but for the reason that her boiler was to be transferred there to 2-6-2 tank No. 4547, which was in need of a new one. No. 4547, incidentally, is unusual in that it has never seen black livery ; it was still G.W. green when overhauled and is now in the new green livery. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) |
|
|