Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 105 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 3965 Week
» 6547 Month
» 271180 Year
» 1492745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 124 m/e 08/1915
GWR 357 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal Mon 02/01/1956
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1915
88C Barry 4w/e 24/01/1953
   Withdrawn 02/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   m/e 31/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1921 Chester G.W.R. sheds in 1921 The recent demise of Chester (West) shed as a loco. depot adds a touch of nostalgic interest to an August, 1921, allocation list of the depot in its Great Western heyday. This list was carefully compiled for two interested schoolboy visitors, by one of the clerks, with the help of the fitter's labourer who had been furnished as the boys' guide. It was probably quite reasonably accurate at its date. Supplementary notes added at the time were : 4309 was the 'pick' of the passenger engines, 3510 a poor steamer so restricted to station pilot duty (Chester General), 2883 just received from the Factory-we were shown the uncompleted receipt for it; no.1 had also just been through the Factory, and was 'all green', with blacked-over chimney-cap. Engines at Chester : (Passenger and Mixed Traffic) 4-4-0 'City': 3709 Quebec, 3711 City of Birmingham, 3719 City of Exeter; 'Flower': 4146 Sydney; 2-6-0 43xx : 4309, 4337, 4341, 4365, 4374, 4381, 4395, 4398, 5315, 5318, 5322, 5336, 5368, 5369, 5370, 5371, 5385, 5386; 2-4-0 'Stella': 3202; ditto (r/b. from 2-4-0T): 3507, 3508, 3510, 3511, 3518, 3519; 0-6-0 'Dean goods': 2419, 2423, 2431, 2438, 2452, 2477; 2-4-2T: 3609; 2-6-2T: 4517, 4528; 2-4-0T: 1; 0-6-0T '2721 class': 2733(s/t), 2778(p/t); 0-4-2T '517' : 1475. (Freight): 2-8-0: 2810, 2818, 2842, 2862, 2864, 2867, 2883; 2-6-0 'Aberdare': 2628, 2653, 2654, 2678; 0-6-0 D/F. 'Beyer': 357; 'Standard Goods': 512, 601, 701. 4' 7½' 'Coal' : 934, 942; 0-6-0T '655 class': 655, 1741, 1745; '850 Class': 857, 987(s/t); '1501 class': 654, 1501(s/t), 1548(s/t). '1854 class': 1863. Total engines: 68 (16 tank.) Two additional engines were also noted during the visit both bearing CHR shed mark : 2-4-0 3505 and 0-6-0 D/F. 'Standard Goods' 403. At that time, 'Dean Goods' 2452 was a war veteran; in the 1939 war Nos. 2419/23/38/77 were requisitioned; the first three were lost, and 2477 was one of the engines sent to China as an U.N.R.R.A. contribution, after return from war service. F.H. SLS/196009

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 124
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 357    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
02/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 357    

prev prev