Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15029 Week
» 68045 Month
» 187572 Year
» 3214425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
11 |
m/e |
12/1914 |
Great Western Railway |
343 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 12/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/10/1955 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
666,041 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1914 |
CVCYS |
|
|
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
23/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 11 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 343 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
05/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 343 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|