Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3563 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16969 Week
» 69985 Month
» 189512 Year
» 3216365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
120 |
m/e |
01/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
441 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway |
322 |
on |
29/03/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 01/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/10/1954 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
811,202 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1915 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
31/01/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/10/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 120 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 441 |
|
|
29/03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 322 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
30/10/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 322 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|