Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 105 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 3965 Week
» 6547 Month
» 271180 Year
» 1492745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 120 m/e 01/1915
GWR 441 y/e 1924
GWR 322 m/e 31/03/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 01/1915
Withdrawal Sat 30/10/1954
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1915
88E Abercynon 4w/e 31/01/1952
   Withdrawn 30/10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   m/e 31/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1915 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 120
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 441    
31/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 322    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
30/10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 322    

prev prev