Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 305 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3760 Week
» 15053 Month
» 279686 Year
» 1501251 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 293 m/e 06/1907

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal During 07/1951
Service Life 44 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
CVRYR   8w/e 23/03/1946
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC RHY Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 10/07/1948
WDN   m/e 31/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 293
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co.
   
23/03/1946 Allocation      
07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 293    

prev prev