Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 285 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3740 Week
» 15033 Month
» 279666 Year
» 1501231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 280 m/e 07/1908

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal Mon 09/05/1949
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1908
CVFDL   4w/e 18/05/1946
   Withdrawn on 09/05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/09/1947
WDN CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 31/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 280
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
18/05/1946 Allocation      
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 280    

prev prev