Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4214 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13788 Week
» 78742 Month
» 281406 Year
» 3308259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Swansea Harbour Trust |
13 |
m/e |
07/1909 |
Great Western Railway |
974 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
Great Western Railway |
1144 |
on |
28/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
SHT/GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 07/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/01/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/01/1960 |
Neath MPD |
Stored on 27th January were 1102/3/4/5/6/44; the withdrawn 0-4-0s 1101/45 are awaiting disposal at Barry Pier. |
SLS/196003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Swansea Harbour Trust Number 13 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
01/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 974 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
28/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1144 |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
08/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1144 |
|
|