Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15041 Week
» 68057 Month
» 187584 Year
» 3214437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Swansea Harbour Trust |
12 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
Great Western Railway |
968 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
Great Western Railway |
1143 |
on |
23/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
SHT/GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Peckett & Co. |
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/11/1960 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1908 |
DG |
|
Danygraig |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
84G |
|
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
1STALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Swansea Harbour Trust Number 12 Built at Peckett & Co. |
|
|
01/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 968 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
23/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1143 |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
16/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1143 |
|
|