Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7183 |
m/e |
06/1930 |
British Railways |
47183 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Sentinel |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
To Service |
During 06/1930 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1955 |
Service Life |
25 yrs , 3 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7183 Built at Sentinel |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47183 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47183 |
|
|
10/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|