Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3684 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30863 Week
» 21919 Month
» 368343 Year
» 3395196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Rhymney Railway (Rhymney) |
112 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
609 |
y/e |
1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
94 |
on |
06/09/1946 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
S |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/05/1954 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
814,914 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
4w/e Sat 09/10/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1908 |
CED |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/05/1954 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Rhymney Railway Number 112 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 609 |
|
|
06/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 94 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
17/05/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 94 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|