Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 41 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14084 Week
» 79038 Month
» 281702 Year
» 3308555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
82 |
m/e |
07/1909 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
P |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 07/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/05/1954 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,037,523 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
4w/e Sat 19/06/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 82 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dowlais Central (rhy) |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
17/05/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|