Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1924 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19727 Week
» 72743 Month
» 192270 Year
» 3219123 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
40 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
R |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/10/1953 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 40 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
26/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40 |
|
|