Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2278 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20081 Week
» 73097 Month
» 192624 Year
» 3219477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
719 |
m/e |
12/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
10943 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
50943 |
y/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
6 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 12/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/12/1948 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1910 |
25E |
|
Sowerby Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/12/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
EXLOAN |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 719 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10943 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50943 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10943 |
|
|