Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 209 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7216 Week
» 13350 Month
» 241234 Year
» 1462799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1537 m/e 03/1910
LMS 10893 y/e 1924
BR 50893 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/04/1950
Service Life 40 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1910
23C Southport 4w/e 22/06/1946
24D Lower Darwen 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 29/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/03/1950
WDN   w/e 29/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1537
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10893    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50893    
29/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 50893    

prev prev