Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 237 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7244 Week
» 13378 Month
» 241262 Year
» 1462827 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1390 m/e 07/1898
LMS 10806 y/e 1924
BR 50806 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/02/1952
Service Life 53 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1898
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948
24F Fleetwood 5w/e 24/12/1949
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 07/10/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 29/09/1951
WDN   w/e 23/02/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1390
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10806    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50806    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
23/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 50806    

prev prev