Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 37 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6013 Week
» 12147 Month
» 240031 Year
» 1461596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1348 m/e 04/1897
LMS 10781 y/e 1924
BR 50781 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/02/1960
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 62 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1897
24D Lower Darwen 01/01/1948
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 07/10/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 31/10/1953
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 05/10/1957
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   w/e 06/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1348
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10781    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50781    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
06/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 50781    

prev prev