Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 208 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7215 Week
» 13349 Month
» 241233 Year
» 1462798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1345 m/e 03/1897
LMS 10778 y/e 1924
BR 50778 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/03/1953
Service Life 56 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1897
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 27/10/1951
WDN   w/e 07/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1345
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10778    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50778    
07/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50778    

prev prev