Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1152 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5967 Week
» 12101 Month
» 239985 Year
» 1461550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1344 m/e 03/1897
LMS 10777 y/e 1924
BR 50777 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal Fri 03/10/1958
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1897
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948
28B Fleetwood 4w/e 24/03/1951
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 06/10/1951
27C Southport 8w/e 14/06/1952
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 24/04/1954
25E Sowerby Bridge 8w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn 03/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 15/04/1950
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 17/03/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 10/07/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   03/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1344
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10777    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50777    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
03/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50777    

prev prev