Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 70 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7077 Week
» 13211 Month
» 241095 Year
» 1462660 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1319 m/e 07/1896
LMS 10752 y/e 1924
BR 50752 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1896
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1957
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1896
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24F Fleetwood 3w/e 14/01/1950
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/09/1950
25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/09/1952
   Withdrawn 12/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 19/08/1950
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   12/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1319
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10752    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50752    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
12/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 50752    

prev