Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7093 Week
» 13227 Month
» 241111 Year
» 1462676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1313 m/e 06/1896
LMS 10746 y/e 1924
BR 50746 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/02/1961
Scrapping During 03/1961
Service Life 64 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1896
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 08/09/1951
27C Southport 4w/e 04/12/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 18/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 27/11/1954
WDN   w/e 18/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910
31/03/1960 Aspinall 2P 2-4-2T By late March, the position relating to the three Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locos. remained unchanged, with 50721 (27A) allocated to Bank Hall and 50746 an 50850 (27C) at Southport. SLS/196006
30/11/1960 Southport MPD Ivatt 2-6-2Ts 41277/328, stored at Buxton since Tutbury branch closure (June, 1960), are in use as station pilots displacing L & Y 2-4-2Ts, 50746/850, which have been placed in store. SLS/196103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1313
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10746    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50746    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
18/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 50746    

prev prev