Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 256 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7263 Week
» 13397 Month
» 241281 Year
» 1462846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 415 m/e 06/1896
LMS 10743 y/e 1924
BR 50743 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal During 06/1950
Service Life 54 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1896
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 04/06/1949
WDN   w/e 03/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 415
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10743    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50743 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 10743    

prev prev