Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 122 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6098 Week
» 12232 Month
» 240116 Year
» 1461681 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1263 m/e 03/1895
LMS 10712 y/e 1924
BR 50712 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1895
Withdrawal During 03/1959
Scrapping During 07/1960
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1895
25D Mirfield 01/01/1948
25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 04/11/1950
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1951
24C Lostock Hall 8w/e 11/07/1953
27C Southport 4w/e 09/10/1954
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 10/08/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 18/03/1950
LOAN 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 28/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1263
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10712    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50712    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 50712    

prev prev