Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 38 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6014 Week
» 12148 Month
» 240032 Year
» 1461597 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1211 m/e 10/1893
LMS 10696 y/e 1924
BR 50696 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1893
Withdrawal During 02/1949
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1893
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 17/01/1948
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/02/1948
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 27/03/1948
WDN   w/e 19/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1211
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10696    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50696 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 10696    

prev prev