Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 235 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7242 Week
» 13376 Month
» 241260 Year
» 1462825 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 46 m/e 09/1893
LMS 10687 y/e 1924
BR 50687 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal During 05/1953
Service Life 59 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1893
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 22/06/1946
23C Southport 01/01/1948
7D Rhyl 4w/e 04/11/1950
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 02/12/1950
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 03/09/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/10/1950
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 19/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 46
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10687    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50687    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
05/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50687    

prev prev