Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6090 Week
» 12224 Month
» 240108 Year
» 1461673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 16 m/e 09/1892
LMS 10678 y/e 1924
BR 50678 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 09/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/12/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1892
23C Southport 01/01/1948
10B Preston 4w/e 04/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 21/10/1950
WDN   w/e 26/12/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 16
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10678    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50678    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
26/12/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50678    

prev prev