Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 94 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6070 Week
» 12204 Month
» 240088 Year
» 1461653 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 624 m/e 08/1893
LMS 12582 y/e 1924
BR 52582 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1893
Withdrawal During 06/1955
Service Life 61 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1893
23B Aintree 01/01/1948
23C Southport 5w/e 24/12/1949
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 17/12/1949
WDN   w/e 28/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 624
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12582    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52582    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 52582    

prev prev