Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1985 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29164 Week
» 20220 Month
» 366644 Year
» 3393497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
20 |
m/e |
06/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12551 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52551 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
898 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 06/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/03/1957 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1947 |
Moor Row MPD |
Living up to its pre-grouping reputation of housing a considerable variety of older locomotive types, Moor Row shed was well worth a visit over Easter week-end. The present stud consists of seven ex-L. & Y. 0-6-0's; three standard 0-6-0 shunting tanks; two Webb 'Coal' tanks; one 'Cauliflower' and four ex F.R. 0-6-0's. Of the latter, 12508 was away for heavy repairs while the remaining three, 12494, 12499, and 12510 were all 'on the active list.' The running of the 9.20 p.m. passenger train from Barrow to Whitehaven is always entrusted to 12499, since she is the only engine at Moor Row capable of maintaining the schedule, or improving it. The load is usually 6 to 8 bogies. During a recent overhaul at Horwich the boilers of 12494 and 12510 were exchanged and now 12494, instead of 12510, is the only example at Moor Row of an F.R. engine with the original type of round-topped boiler: the others carry Belpaire boilers of the L. & Y. type. The two Webb 0 6 2 tanks are 7699 and 27553. Both were sent to Moor Row to work the re-established passenger service between Whitehaven, Moor Row, Egremont and Sellafleld. 7699 still carries her 2A shed plate, but 27553 has had her's (10E) removed. The single 'Cauliflower' is No. 28441. The three standard shunting tanks are 7317, 7337, and 7390, and they are regarded as the best locomotives at the depot. The L. & Y. types are a motley collection, the latest addition being 12551, the only superheated engine at Moor Row. She still carries a 10B shed plate and is in very indifferent order. An unusual visitor to this area has been 4-4-0 No. 673 which, was attached to Moor Row shed from Upperby for special duty. When she arrived she was nearly due for a major overhaul and is now standing outside the shed, with coupling rods removed, waiting to be removed to Derby for repairs. |
SLS/194705 |
08/06/1948 |
West Cumberland |
With the suspension of the passenger service between Whitehaven, Moor Row and Sellafield, via Egremont, Moor Row Shed has lost the two 0-6-2 Webb Coal tanks allocated for working this service. The stock there at present comprises three standard '3F' 0-6-0 tanks (Nos. 47337, 7390 and 7525), three ex-Furness 0-6-0's (Nos. 12494/9 and 12510) and six ex-L. & Y. 0-6-0's (Nos. 12098, 12110/84, 12285, 12418 and 12551). Of the latter, No. 12551, the only superheated engine at Moor Row is scheduled for an early transfer to shed 4A. In spite of the cessation of passenger traffic between Whitehaven and Sellafield, via Moor Row and Egremont, the station buildings at each place have just been painted (8/6). The re-lining of Whitehaven tunnel, which has now been in progress for 15 years, still continues, over 60 men being employed in the bore every night between 11 p.m. and 4.30 a.m. It is expected that the work will take a year or two more to complete. The 5.10 p.m. stopping train from Whitehaven (Bransty) to Carlisle Is now a regular duty for one of the new '4F' 2-6-0's allocated to Workington shed. No. 3007 was noted on this on 8/6. |
SLS/194808 |
12/08/1957 |
Last L.Y.R. 0-6-0 Class 28 |
52551 was shedded at Moor Row for a number of years prior to and during the last war, sharing the working of the 9-20 p.m. passenger from Barrow to Whitehaven (Corkickle) with 12110. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 20 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12551 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Moor Row (12E) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52551 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52551 |
|
|