Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 252 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7259 Week
» 13393 Month
» 241277 Year
» 1462842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 636 m/e 07/1909
LMS 12523 y/e 1924
BR 52523 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 53 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1909
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 24/12/1949
24C Lostock Hall 3w/e 14/01/1950
24E Blackpool Central m/e 16/06/1956
26C Bolton w/e 22/11/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1909 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 636
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12523    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52523    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 52523    

prev prev