Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
115 |
m/e |
05/1906 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12437 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52437 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 05/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/05/1956 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 115 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12437 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52437 |
|
|
05/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52437 |
|
|