Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7093 Week
» 13227 Month
» 241111 Year
» 1462676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 684 m/e 02/1898
LMS 12381 y/e 1924
BR 52381 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/02/1956
Scrapping During 03/1956
Service Life 58 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1898
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 18/02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 27B Greenock Ladyburn w/e 01/04/1950
WDN   w/e 18/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 684
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12381    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52381    
18/02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 52381    

prev prev