Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 251 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7258 Week
» 13392 Month
» 241276 Year
» 1462841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 40 m/e 06/1895
LMS 12278 y/e 1924
BR 52278 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 06/1895
Withdrawal During 08/1959
Scrapping During 08/1959
Service Life 64 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1895
24B Rose Grove 01/01/1948
23C Southport 3w/e 11/12/1948
27B Aintree 8w/e 29/11/1952
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 01/12/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   18/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 40
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12278    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52278    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52278    

prev prev