Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 55 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7062 Week
» 13196 Month
» 241080 Year
» 1462645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 333 m/e 01/1895
LMS 12272 y/e 1924
BR 52272 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 01/1895
Withdrawal During 04/1955
Service Life 60 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1895
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 03/01/1953
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 04/12/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 27/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 333
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12272    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52272    
03/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 52272    

prev prev