Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 82 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6058 Week
» 12192 Month
» 240076 Year
» 1461641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 270 m/e 12/1894
LMS 12271 y/e 1924
BR 52271 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/08/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 66 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1894
23C Southport 01/01/1948
26D Bury 4w/e 04/11/1950
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/10/1953
26E Lees (Oldham) w/e 06/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 05/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 270
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12271    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52271    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
05/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52271    

prev prev