Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 70 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7077 Week
» 13211 Month
» 241095 Year
» 1462660 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1148 m/e 04/1892
LMS 12161 y/e 1924
BR 52161 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/10/1960
Scrapping During 10/1960
Service Life 68 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1892
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   To Horwich Works 4w/e 28/12/1957
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 19/04/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HOR Horsham 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 19/04/1958
EXLOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   w/e 01/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1148
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12161    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52161    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Horwich Works (99H)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
01/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52161    

prev prev