Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1181 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6965 Week
» 28354 Month
» 147881 Year
» 3174734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12131 |
15/11/1952 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
15/11/1952 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
16/04/1969 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/11/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12131 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/04/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12131 |
|
|