Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3602 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13176 Week
» 78130 Month
» 280794 Year
» 3307647 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12122 |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12122 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12122 |
|
|
06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Oak Disposal Point: Crigglestone, Wakefield |
|
|